Senate | 04/29/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Wallan. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 6--Chaichi, Marsh, McLain, Nelson, Tran, Walters; Excused, 3--Nguyen H, Smith G, Valderrama. | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 22, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 21, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Referred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water. | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |