Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Public Hearing Scheduled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2025
|
Possible Work Session scheduled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
First reading. Referred to President's desk.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Third reading. Carried by Wright. Passed. Ayes, 49; Excused, 3--Nguyen H, Smith G, Valderrama; Excused for Business of the House, 8--Boshart Davis, Drazan, Elmer, McIntire, Osborne, Owens, Reschke, Scharf.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Rules suspended. Carried over to April 22, 2025 Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Rules suspended. Carried over to April 21, 2025 Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Work Session scheduled.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Referred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
|
|
|