Senate | 05/07/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Referred to Housing and Development. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Osborne. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 2--Neron, Walters; Excused, 5--Dobson, McDonald, Nguyen H, Sosa, Valderrama; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Hartman, McIntire, Reschke, Sanchez. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 17, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 16, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Housing and Homelessness. | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |