Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3927 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                            1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
83rd OREGON LEGISLATIVE ASSEMBLY--2025 Regular Session
House Bill 3927
Sponsored by Representative EDWARDS
SUMMARY
The following summary is not prepared by the sponsors of the measure and is not a part of the body thereof subject
to consideration by the Legislative Assembly. It is an editor’s brief statement of the essential features of the
measure as introduced.The statement includes a measure digest written in compliance with applicable readability
standards.
Digest: Tells ODOE to study the need to build more electric transmission lines. Tells ODOE to
build two electric transmission projects. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.3).
Requires the State Department of Energy to study the need to expand electric transmission
infrastructure in this state. Directs the department to submit findings to the interim committees of
the Legislative Assembly related to energy no later than September 15, 2026.
Establishes the Oregon Electric Transmission Expansion Fund.Requires the State Department
of Energy to develop two electric transmission expansion projects no later than January 1, 2036.
Appropriates moneys to the fund over five biennia.
Sunsets the fund on January 2, 2036.
A BILL FOR AN ACT
Relating to electric transmission infrastructure.
Be It Enacted by the People of the State of Oregon:
SECTION 1.	The State Department of Energy shall study the need to expand electric
transmission infrastructure in this state.The department shall submit a report in the
manner provided by ORS 192.245, and may include recommendations for legislation, to the
interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to energy no later than September
15, 2026.
SECTION 2.	Section 1 of this 2025 Act is repealed on January 2, 2027.
SECTION 3.(1) The Oregon Electric Transmission Expansion Fund is established in the
State Treasury, separate and distinct from the General Fund. Moneys in the fund are con-
tinuously appropriated to the State Department of Energy for the purpose described in sub-
section (4) of this section.
(2) The fund consists of moneys appropriated, allocated, deposited or transferred to the
fund by the Legislative Assembly or otherwise.
(3) Moneys in the fund may be invested as provided in ORS 293.701 to 293.857, and interest
earned on the moneys in the fund must be credited to the fund.
(4) The department shall use moneys in the fund to develop two electric transmission
expansion projects. The department shall complete the two projects no later than January
1,2036.
SECTION 4.In addition to and not in lieu of any other appropriation, there is appropri-
ated to the State Department of Energy, for the biennium beginning July 1, 2025, out of the
General Fund, the amount of $8,000,000,000, for deposit in the Oregon Electric Transmission
Expansion Fund established in section 3 of this 2025 Act.
SECTION 5.In addition to and not in lieu of any other appropriation, there is appropri-
ated to the State Department of Energy, for the biennium beginning July 1, 2027, out of the
General Fund, the amount of $8,000,000,000, for deposit in the Oregon Electric Transmission
NOTE:Matter in boldfaced type in an amended section is new; matter [italic and bracketed] is existing law to be omitted.
New sections are in boldfaced type.
LC 4636 HB3927
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
Expansion Fund established in section 3 of this 2025 Act.
SECTION 6.	In addition to and not in lieu of any other appropriation, there is appropri-
ated to the State Department of Energy, for the biennium beginning July 1, 2029, out of the
General Fund, the amount of $8,000,000,000, for deposit in the Oregon Electric Transmission
Expansion Fund established in section 3 of this 2025 Act.
SECTION 7.In addition to and not in lieu of any other appropriation, there is appropri-
ated to the State Department of Energy, for the biennium beginning July 1, 2031, out of the
General Fund, the amount of $8,000,000,000, for deposit in the Oregon Electric Transmission
Expansion Fund established in section 3 of this 2025 Act.
SECTION 8.In addition to and not in lieu of any other appropriation, there is appropri-
ated to the State Department of Energy, for the biennium beginning July 1, 2033, out of the
General Fund, the amount of $8,000,000,000, for deposit in the Oregon Electric Transmission
Expansion Fund established in section 3 of this 2025 Act.
SECTION 9.(1) Section 3 of this 2025 Act is repealed on January 2, 2036.
(2) Unobligated moneys remaining in the Oregon Electric Transmission Expansion Fund
on the date described in subsection (1) of this section shall revert to the General Fund.
[2]