House | 05/01/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Referred to Climate, Energy, and Environment with subsequent referral to Revenue. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |