Senate | 05/08/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Referred to Health Care. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Javadi. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 3--Nguyen H, Smith G, Valderrama; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Drazan, Osborne, Speaker Fahey. | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 22, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 21, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 17, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care. | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |