House | 04/30/2025 | Informational Meeting scheduled. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Public Hearing cancelled. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Informational Meeting held. | ||
House | 01/18/2025 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. | ||
House | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Ways and Means. | ||
House | 01/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |