Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HCR1 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

                            83rd OREGON LEGISLATIVE ASSEMBLY--2025 Regular Session
Enrolled
House Concurrent Resolution 1
Sponsored by Representative BOSHART DAVIS, Senator MANNING JR (Presession filed.)
Whereas Private First Class Shawnacee Loren Noble was born on May 12, 1972, in Livermore,
California, to Raymond and Martha Noble; and
Whereas Private First Class Noble grew up in Sweet Home, Oregon, the sixth of seven children,
and he moved to Albany, Oregon, after his father passed away; and
Whereas Private First Class Noble graduated from West Albany High School; and
Whereas Private First Class Noble enjoyed fishing and spending time with his family and
friends;and
Whereas Private First Class Noble considered a career as a chef, but he instead set his sights
on following in the footsteps of his father and brother by pursuing a career in the military; and
Whereas Private First Class Noble enlisted in the Oregon National Guard after his junior year
in high school under the Split Training Option program; and
Whereas Private First Class Noble graduated from high school in June 1990 and underwent
training as a combat engineer at Fort Leonard Wood, Missouri; and
Whereas as a member of Company C, 1249th Engineer Battalion, Private First Class Noble at-
tained the rank of Specialist; and
Whereas when the crisis in the Persian Gulf developed in 1990, Private First Class Noble vol-
untarily joined the regular United States Army to serve in Operation Desert Storm, despite being
required to take a reduction in rank; and
Whereas Private First Class Noble was assigned to Company B, 5th Engineer Battalion, and he
deployed with that unit to Saudi Arabia on January 17, 1991; and
Whereas Private First Class Noble showed great courage and leadership during dozens of com-
bat missions with his unit during Operation Desert Storm; and
Whereas while on active duty, Private First Class Noble contracted a severe viral infection,
causing him to pass away from pneumonia on April 11, 1991; and
Whereas Private First Class Noble was laid to rest on April 18, 1991, in Liberty-Nye Cemetery
in Sweet Home, Oregon, with full military honors supplied by an honor guard from Fort Lewis,
Washington;and
Whereas Private First Class Noble was 18 years old when he passed away, and he will be for-
ever loved and never forgotten; and
Whereas Private First Class Noble was an outstanding soldier who served his country with
honor and distinction; now, therefore,
Be It Resolved by the Legislative Assembly of the State of Oregon:
That we, the members of the Eighty-third Legislative Assembly, recognize and honor Private
First Class Shawnacee Loren Noble for his service to his country.
Enrolled House Concurrent Resolution 1 (HCR 1-INTRO)	Page 1 Adopted by House February 20, 2025
Timothy G. Sekerak, Chief Clerk of House
Julie Fahey, Speaker of House
Adopted by Senate March 11, 2025
Rob Wagner, President of Senate
Enrolled House Concurrent Resolution 1 (HCR 1-INTRO)	Page 2