House
|
04/15/2025
|
Filed with Secretary of State.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
President signed.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Final reading. Carried by Bonham. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Reynolds, Woods.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Carried over to 04-14 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Carried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Carried over to 04-09 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Carried over to 04-08 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Carried over to 04-07 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Carried over to 04-03 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Carried over to 04-02 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Carried over to 04-01 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Carried over to 03-31 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Carried over to 03-27 by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Recommendation: Do adopt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Work Session scheduled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Public Hearing held.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Referred to Rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
First reading. Referred to President's desk.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Drazan. Adopted. Ayes, 54; Excused, 6--Evans, Grayber, McDonald, Nguyen H, Scharf, Smith G.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on 02-25 Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Recommendation: Be adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Public Hearing and Work Session held.
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2025
|
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
|
|
|