1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 83rd OREGON LEGISLATIVE ASSEMBLY--2025 Regular Session House Concurrent Resolution 11 Sponsored by Representative BOICE SUMMARY The following summary is not prepared by the sponsors of the measure and is not a part of the body thereof subject to consideration by the Legislative Assembly. It is an editor’s brief statement of the essential features of the measure as introduced.The statement includes a measure digest written in compliance with applicable readability standards. Digest: Creates a day of remembrance for all of the people that lost their lives at Tiananmen Square on June 4, 1989. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.6). Declares June 4, 2025, Communist Survival Day in honor of all those who lost their lives during the June 4, 1989, massacre on Tiananmen Square. CONCURRENT RESOLUTION Whereas on April 15, 1989, peaceful demonstrators gathered in Tiananmen Square in central Beijing to mourn the death of Hu Yaobang, the former General Secretary of the Chinese Communist Party (CCP), who was forced to resign in 1987 for supporting political reforms within the CCP; and Whereas throughout April and May 1989, citizens from all walks of life, including students, government employees, journalists, police officers and members of the Armed Forces, gathered peacefully in Tiananmen Square to call upon the Government of the People’s Republic of China to eliminate corruption, accelerate economic and political reform, and protect human rights, especially the freedoms of expression and assembly; and Whereas peaceful demonstrations spread from Tiananmen Square to approximately 400 cities across the People’s Republic of China, and by May 17, 1989, an estimated one million Chinese citi- zens had gathered in peaceful protest in Tiananmen Square; and Whereas on May 20, 1989, the Government of the People’s Republic of China declared martial law, and during the late afternoon and early evening hours of June 3, 1989, government leadership sent armed People’s Liberation Army (PLA) troops and tanks into Beijing and surrounding areas; and Whereas on the night of June 3, 1989, and continuing into the morning of June 4, PLA soldiers, at the direction of CCP leadership, fired indiscriminately into crowds of peaceful protesters, killing and injuring thousands of demonstrators and other unarmed civilians; and Whereas June 4, 2025, marked the 36th anniversary of the massacre at Tiananmen Square; and Whereas to this day the Government of the People’s Republic of China continues to censor any mention of the massacre at Tiananmen Square, preventing the victims from being publicly mourned and remembered, and harassing, detaining and arresting those who call for a full, public and inde- pendent accounting of the wounded, dead and those imprisoned for participating in the peaceful demonstrations of the spring of 1989; and Whereas the Government of the People’s Republic of China continues to violate the human rights of prodemocracy activists, members of ethnic groups, religious believers, human rights law- yers, citizen journalists, labor union leaders and countless others seeking to express their political or religious views or ethnic identity in a peaceful manner; now, therefore, Be It Resolved by the Legislative Assembly of the State of Oregon: NOTE:Matter in boldfaced type in an amended section is new; matter [italic and bracketed] is existing law to be omitted. New sections are in boldfaced type. LC 1893 HCR11 1 2 3 4 That we, the members of the Eighty-third Legislative Assembly, declare that June 4th, 2025, shall be named Communist Survival Day in recognition and honor of those who so bravely gave their lives at Tiananmen Square on June 4, 1989. [2]