Senate | 05/01/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Recommendation: Do adopt. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Public Hearing and Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Referred to Rules. | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Read. Carried by Lively. Adopted. Ayes, 48; Excused, 10--Boshart Davis, Cate, Diehl, Drazan, Elmer, Evans, Javadi, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Skarlatos; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Breese-Iverson, Wallan. | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |