Senate | 04/28/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Rules. | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Bowman. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Levy B, Nguyen H; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Neron, Speaker Fahey. | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on 04-24 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Carried over to April 2, 2025 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Public Hearing and Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |