Senate | 04/30/2025 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Public Hearing and Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Rules. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Valderrama. Adopted. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Cate, Evans, Helfrich, Nguyen H; Excused for Business of the House, 1--McLain. | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on 04-03 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |