Senate | 05/05/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Rules. | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Bowman. Adopted. Ayes, 54; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Helm, Nguyen H, Skarlatos; Excused for Business of the House, 2--McIntire, Speaker Fahey. | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on 05-01 Calendar. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Public Hearing and Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |