House | 03/31/2025 | Filed with Secretary of State. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | President signed. | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Speaker signed. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Special Order of Business. Final reading. Carried by Thatcher. Adopted. Ayes, 30. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Taken from 03-25 Calendar and placed on 03-27 Calendar as a Special Order of Business on voice vote. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Recommendation: Do adopt. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Referred to Rules. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Drazan. Adopted. Ayes, 54; Excused, 6--Evans, Grayber, McDonald, Nguyen H, Scharf, Smith G. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business immediately. | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |