House | 04/28/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Referred to Economic Development, Small Business, and Trade. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Bonham. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Patterson; Excused, 3--Linthicum, Thatcher, Woods. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Carried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Referred to Labor and Business. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |