House | 04/29/2025 | Referred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water. | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Vote explanation(s) filed by Robinson. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Nash. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Hayden, Robinson. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Carried over to 04-28 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Carried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Carried over to 04-23 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means (Printed A-Eng.) Referral denied by order of the President. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Referred to Labor and Business. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |