House | 05/06/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans. | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Carried over to 04-22 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Possible Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Referred to Energy and Environment. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |