House
|
05/07/2025
|
Work Session scheduled.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Public Hearing scheduled.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Referred to Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 10--Bonham, Girod, Hayden, Linthicum, McLane, Nash, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 2--Starr, Woods.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 11; Nays, 17--Broadman, Campos, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Gorsek, Jama, Lieber, Manning Jr, Meek, Patterson, Pham, Prozanski, Reynolds, Sollman, Taylor, President Wagner; Excused, 2--Starr, Woods.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng Minority)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Recommendation: Do pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Public Hearing held.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
|
|
|