House | 05/01/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Starr declared potential conflict of interest. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Starr. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Woods. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Carried over to 04-09 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Carried over to 04-08 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Carried over to 04-07 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Taken from 03-31 Calendar and placed on 04-03 Calendar on voice vote. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Carried over to 03-31 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Carried over to 03-27 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Referred to Early Childhood and Behavioral Health. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |