House | 04/30/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Referred to Judiciary. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Third reading. Carried by McLane. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Bonham, Robinson; Excused, 1--Woods. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |