House | 04/23/2025 | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Campos. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 12--Anderson, Bonham, Girod, Hayden, Linthicum, McLane, Nash, Robinson, Smith DB, Starr, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 1--Woods. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Carried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Referred to Health Care. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |