Senate | 04/21/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Referred to Finance and Revenue by order of the President. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Finance and Revenue. (Printed A-Eng.) | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Veterans, Emergency Management, Federal and World Affairs. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |