House | 04/15/2025 | Referred to Judiciary. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Bonham, Hayden, Nash, Robinson; Excused, 1--Woods. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Carried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Carried over to 04-09 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |