House | 04/23/2025 | Referred to Education. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 13--Anderson, Bonham, Girod, Hayden, Linthicum, McLane, Nash, Robinson, Smith DB, Sollman, Starr, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 1--Woods. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Carried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |