1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 83rd OREGON LEGISLATIVE ASSEMBLY--2025 Regular Session Senate Bill 313 Printed pursuant to Senate Interim Rule 213.28 by order of the President of the Senate in conformance with pre- session filing rules, indicating neither advocacy nor opposition on the part of the President (at the request of Senate Interim Committee on Education) SUMMARY The following summary is not prepared by the sponsors of the measure and is not a part of the body thereof subject to consideration by the Legislative Assembly. It is an editor’s brief statement of the essential features of the measure as introduced.The statement includes a measure digest written in compliance with applicable readability standards. Digest: The Act tells DAS to develop an implementation plan to make a collective bargaining process that would apply to teachers across the state. The Act would take effect 91 days after sine die. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.9). Directs the Oregon Department of Administrative Services to develop an implementation plan for a statewide collective bargaining process for licensed educators in this state. Requires the department to convene an advisory board to advise the department in developing theplan. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. A BILL FOR AN ACT Relating to an implementation plan for statewide collective bargaining for licensed educators; and prescribing an effective date. Be It Enacted by the People of the State of Oregon: SECTION 1. (1) As used in this section: (a) “Central table bargaining team” means a collective bargaining team that negotiates and sets foundational terms and conditions of a collective bargaining agreement that relate specifically to the salary and benefits of licensed educators statewide. (b) “Labor organization” has the meaning given that term in ORS 243.650. (c) “Licensed educator” has the meaning given that term in ORS 342.621. (d) “Local table bargaining team” means a collective bargaining team that negotiates terms and conditions of employment, other than salary and benefits, for licensed educators at the local school district level. (2)(a) The Oregon Department of Administrative Services shall develop an implementa- tion plan for establishing a statewide collective bargaining process for licensed educators in this state. (b) For the purpose of developing the implementation plan under this section, the de- partment shall convene an advisory group, consisting of representatives from: (A) The Department of Education; (B) The Coalition of Oregon School Administrators; (C) The Oregon Education Association; (D) The Oregon School Boards Association; (E) The office of the Governor with expertise in the state budget process and school funding; (F) The Oregon Association of School Business Officials; (G) One or more labor organizations that represent public employees; NOTE:Matter in boldfaced type in an amended section is new; matter [italic and bracketed] is existing law to be omitted. New sections are in boldfaced type. LC 943 SB313 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 31 32 33 34 35 36 37 38 39 40 (H) The Public Employees’ Benefit Board; (I) The Oregon Educators Benefit Board; (J) The Oregon Department of Administrative Services with legal expertise in public employee collective bargaining; and (K) The majority and minority parties of the House of Representatives and the Senate. (c) The advisory group formed as provided in paragraph (b) of this section shall advise regarding: (A) The development and implementation of the plan. (B) Adoption of rules by the Oregon Department of Administrative Services for the im- plementation of the plan. (3) The implementation plan developed under this section must: (a) Establish a framework for a statewide collective bargaining process for licensed edu- cators employed in school districts and education service districts across this state. (b) Examine salaries and benefits for licensed educators in relation to the state budget allocation for public school funding. (c) Contemplate a collective bargaining framework that mandates bargaining through: (A) A central table bargaining team consisting of representatives from the Department of Education, school district boards and state government who have knowledge and expertise in education funding; and (B) A local table bargaining team. (d) Provide strategies for bargaining over salary and benefits relative to the budget ap- propriated for school funding. (e) Consider methods for achieving additional funding for purposes of adjusting the sala- ries and benefits of licensed educators in the event that the estimated budget appropriation to cover such costs is determined to be insufficient. (f) Provide timelines for collective bargaining that aligns with the state budget policy and processtimelines. (4)(a) No later than December 1, 2026, the Oregon Department of Administrative Services shall provide a progress report to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to education on the status of the implementation plan described under this section. (b) No later than December 1, 2027, the department shall provide a draft report and no later than December 1, 2028, a final report, in the manner provided in ORS 192.245, to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to education on the findings and recommendations of the department regarding the statewide collective bargaining for li- censed educators, including recommendations for legislative changes necessary to require statewide collective bargaining for licensed educators by July 1, 2029. SECTION 2. Section 1 of this 2025 Act is repealed on January 2, 2030. SECTION 3.This 2025 Act takes effect on the 91st day after the date on which the 2025 regular session of the Eighty-third Legislative Assembly adjourns sine die. [2]