House | 05/19/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hayden, Patterson, Starr. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Referred to Judiciary. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |