House | 04/24/2025 | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection. | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 11--Anderson, Bonham, Girod, Hayden, Linthicum, McLane, Robinson, Smith DB, Starr, Thatcher, Weber. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Labor and Business. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |