House | 05/15/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
House | 05/13/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
House | 05/13/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski, Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Linthicum, Thatcher, Woods. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Carried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Labor and Business. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |