House | 04/30/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Referred to Housing and Homelessness. | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Pham. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Robinson; Excused, 2--Reynolds, Woods. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Housing and Development. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |