Senate | 05/02/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Returned to Full Committee. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2025 | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Ways and Means. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |