Senate | 04/16/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Public Hearing Cancelled. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Informational Meeting held. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Informational Meeting scheduled. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2025 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Ways and Means. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |