Senate | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Labor and Business, then Ways and Means. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |