House | 05/05/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Referred to Labor and Workplace Standards. | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Meek, Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Smith DB, Woods. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Carried over to 03-24 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Labor and Business. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |