House | 05/01/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Frederick, Linthicum, Starr. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Human Services, then Ways and Means. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |