House | 05/07/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Referred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Gelser Blouin. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Bonham; Excused, 2--Starr, Woods. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Carried over to 04-02 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |