House | 05/06/2025 | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 7, 2025 Calendar. | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Referred to Education. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Gelser Blouin. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Linthicum, Thatcher, Woods. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Carried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |