Senate | 03/24/2025 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass and referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Public Hearing Cancelled. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Early Childhood and Behavioral Health. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |