House | 05/06/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Judiciary. | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 30. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |