Senate | 04/15/2025 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Housing and Development. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |