Senate | 03/27/2025 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2025 | Referred to Judiciary by order of the President. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2025 | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Judiciary. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |