House | 04/30/2025 | Motion to rerefer to Labor and Workplace Standards carried. Rereferred. | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Second reading. | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Referred to Labor and Workplace Standards. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 10--Anderson, Bonham, Girod, Linthicum, McLane, Nash, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 3--Hayden, Patterson, Starr. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Labor and Business. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |