House
|
05/05/2025
|
Speaker signed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
President signed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Third reading. Carried by Elmer. Passed. Ayes, 49; Excused, 6--Boshart Davis, Helm, Javadi, Nguyen H, Owens, Skarlatos; Excused for Business of the House, 5--McDonald, McIntire, Nosse, Reschke, Yunker.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2025 Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Recommendation: Do pass.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Work Session scheduled.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Public Hearing scheduled.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Referred to Labor and Workplace Standards.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Robinson; Excused, 2--Frederick, Linthicum.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Public Hearing and Work Session held.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Public Hearing held.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2025
|
Referred to Labor and Business.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
|
|
|