Senate | 05/05/2025 | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2025 | Referred to Rules by order of the President. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2025 | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2025 | Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage rescind subsequent referral to Judiciary and be referred to Rules. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Possible Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Energy and Environment, then Judiciary. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |