House | 05/06/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection. | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Linthicum, McLane, Nash, Robinson, Smith DB; Excused, 1--Woods. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Carried over to 04-08 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Carried over to 04-07 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Carried over to 04-03 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | Referred to Labor and Business. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |