House | 04/28/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Referred to Education. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Sollman; Excused, 3--Hayden, Patterson, Woods. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |