House | 05/01/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care. | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Woods. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Carried over to 03-25 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Referred to Health Care by order of the President. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Health Care. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Human Services. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |