House | 04/29/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Referred to Rules. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Gelser Blouin. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 13--Anderson, Bonham, Girod, Hayden, Linthicum, McLane, Meek, Nash, Robinson, Smith DB, Starr, Thatcher, Weber. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Carried over to 04-28 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Carried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Carried over to 04-23 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Public Hearing Scheduled. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |