House | 05/06/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Judiciary. | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 11--Anderson, Bonham, Girod, Hayden, Linthicum, McLane, Robinson, Smith DB, Starr, Thatcher, Weber. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Work Session held. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |