House | 05/05/2025 | Public Hearing scheduled. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Referred to Education. | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Third reading. Carried by Gelser Blouin. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 5--Anderson, Bonham, Linthicum, Nash, Robinson; Excused, 4--Frederick, Starr, Thatcher, Woods. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Carried over to 04-01 by unanimous consent. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Recommendation: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Work Session scheduled. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Public Hearing held. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |